SWILLINGTON MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523963
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN SMITH Trustee 01 March 2012 None on record
LESLEY PALMER Trustee None on record
Mark Turnbull Trustee 01 December 2019 None on record
COUNCILLOR MARK DAVID DOBSON Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
DANIEL JOSEPH ALDERSON Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Saul Conlon Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record