Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window