Trustees NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Deric Bailey Chair 24 June 2020
None on record
Owen Rhys Dyde Trustee 13 July 2022
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Dorothy Bailey Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Judith Ann Edgeley Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
KAREN LESLEY EMMENS Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Patricia Viggars Trustee 17 May 2018
25TH KNUTTON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
KIBBLESTONE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
VERA BLOOR Trustee 22 June 2017
None on record
Ian David Pritchard Trustee 22 June 2017
None on record
Kevin John Stanyer Trustee 10 September 2014
None on record
Laura Dorothy Boyles Trustee 25 June 2014
None on record
John Barrett Champ Trustee 17 May 2012
None on record
MR S BROADHURST Trustee
None on record
GRAHAM BADDELEY Trustee
74TH STOKE ON TRENT AND NEWCASTLE (SILVERDALE ST LUKES) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
DAVID PAUL GRAY Trustee
None on record