Financial history NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £39.89k £44.70k £53.35k £8.38k £19.89k
Total expenditure £34.59k £41.91k £44.89k £8.35k £20.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.33k N/A £9.90k N/A N/A