WREXHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL JOHN MEADOWS Trustee 31 October 2012
ERLAS VICTORIAN WALLED GARDEN Received: On time
Karen Leigh Cheesbrough Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record
MR David Cheesbrough Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Elizabeth Dodman Trustee 22 April 2017 None on record
SUSAN LISTER Trustee None on record
Alison Claire Dwight Chair 22 April 2017 None on record
Nicola Judith Morris Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Aaron Wright Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Stephen George Brown Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
IAN CHARLES MCLEAN Trustee None on record
David Morris Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record