Financial history 1ST POYNTON (ST GEORGES) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £30.27k £29.28k £24.62k £20.72k £28.48k
Total expenditure £21.07k £21.77k £20.93k £10.09k £17.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £820 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £11.92k