Trustees 1ST POYNTON (ST GEORGES) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oliver Alexis Hardman Chair 14 May 2019
None on record
Charles Walker Trustee 13 March 2020
None on record
Dr Huw John Ricketts Trustee 07 February 2017
None on record
Steve Gale Trustee 06 September 2016
None on record
DR JOLENE RENEE PATER Trustee 21 January 2012
None on record
MICHELLE ANN MARTIN Trustee 21 January 2012
None on record
MALCOLM WOOD Trustee
None on record
SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION Trustee
None on record
SUZANNE WARDLE Trustee
None on record