Accounts and annual returns THE LADY HAWKINS'S SCHOOL ENDOWMENT

Charity number: 527251
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 March 2024 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1600 days