Trustees THE LADY HAWKINS'S SCHOOL ENDOWMENT

Charity number: 527251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Christina Banks Chair 16 October 2014
HERGEST TRUST
Received: On time
Rachel Mary Mountford Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Philippa Dixon Trustee 23 May 2019
None on record
Caroline Esther Rolls Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
REBECCA HAYDON Trustee 17 March 2011
None on record
MRS J N JONES Trustee
KINGTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
HARVEY RICHARD JONES Trustee
None on record