Financial history ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW

Charity number: 527408
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £747.31k £1.16m £1.18m £1.30m £2.00m
Total expenditure £1.15m £1.35m £1.53m £1.22m £1.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £30.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £549.27k £106.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £75.68k £273.78k £109.12k £653.35k £996.80k
Income - Other trading activities £38.89k £135.46k £41.88k £10.88k £6.10k
Income - Charitable activities £555.26k £689.37k £957.78k £596.96k £959.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £77.49k £60.61k £67.04k £37.81k £38.04k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £996.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.12m £1.32m £1.48m £1.19m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.28k £30.81k £50.82k £27.75k £38.62k
Expenditure - Governance £33.97k £17.92k £11.50k £0 £6.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.64k £8.82k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0