Trustees ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW

Charity number: 527408
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Revd Paul Swarbrick Trustee 09 April 2018
THE LANCASTER UNIVERSITY CHAPLAINCY CENTRE
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LANCASHIRE
Received: On time
Rt Rev Marcus Nigel Stock Trustee 12 December 2014
None on record
Rt Rev Ralph Heskett Trustee 12 December 2014
None on record
Rt Rev JOHN STANLEY KENNETH ARNOLD Trustee 30 September 2014
THE NEWMAN TRUST
Overdue by 18 days
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: 77 days late
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: 72 days late
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
THE ATLANTIC TRADING CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 18 days
GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER
Overdue by 200 days
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LANCASHIRE
Received: On time
MOST REVEREND MALCOLM PATRICK MCMAHON OP Trustee 01 May 2014
ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
RT REV MARK DAVIES Trustee 15 November 2013
SHREWSBURY ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY (SHREWSBURY DIOCESE) INC
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY
Received: On time
SHREWSBURY ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CHESHIRE
Received: On time
Rt Rev Terence Patrick Drainey Trustee 15 November 2013
JAMES WHITE BEQUEST ICW THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AT THORNABY-ON-TEES
Overdue by 565 days
BRUYERE FUND
Overdue by 565 days
SHAW FUND
Overdue by 565 days
MADONNA HOUSE (UNITED KINGDOM)
Received: 16 days late
BLENKINSOP EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Overdue by 565 days
CHARITIES IN CONNEXION WITH CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST
Overdue by 565 days