THE LLOYD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required