NEWARK PREPARATORY SCHOOL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 528261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £844.34k £1.34m £1.10m £1.17m £1.08m
Total expenditure £1.01m £1.48m £1.06m £1.14m £1.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £835.69k £1.32m £1.08m £1.16m £1.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2 £2 £1 £0 £0
Income - Other £8.64k £11.14k £12.79k £11.13k £9.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £984.95k £1.48m £1.06m £1.14m £1.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £27.16k £50.92k £8.53k £16.87k £25.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0