MORETON HALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 528409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 October 2020 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 October 2020 115 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 17 May 2017 On time Download