THE PERCIVAL GUILDHOUSE

Charity number: 528782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £215.64k £280.52k £247.44k £272.32k £279.03k
Total expenditure £240.87k £285.03k £246.93k £283.96k £238.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £24.83k