Trustees AYSGARTH SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 529538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Stuart Thompson | Chair | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Consett | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES BROOKSBANK | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Lorraine Faithorn Cadogan | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Victoria Sian Savile | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
William Martin Alastair Land | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
SARAH GUTHE | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edmund Justin Nolan | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES LUKE BOURNE-ARTON | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher York | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BENNET HOSKYNS-ABRAHALL | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES CHRISTIAN FABER | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM JAMES ROE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.