THE BRONTE SOCIETY

Charity number: 529952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.10m £1.20m £1.19m £1.89m £1.07m
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.35m £1.45m £1.34m £1.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £59.77k £55.88k £174.38k £232.50k £448.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £104.13k £29.77k £18.80k £696.75k £156.66k
Income - Other trading activities £318.85k £411.01k £366.36k £327.38k £107.52k
Income - Charitable activities £662.31k £744.63k £794.81k £860.25k £799.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.68k £16.05k £9.82k £7.21k £3.82k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.00k £0 £3.04k
Income - Legacies £64.19k £1.31k £1.00k £2.23k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £845.71k £1.07m £1.19m £1.08m £886.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £284.01k £285.89k £262.03k £258.41k £157.24k
Expenditure - Governance £75.54k £96.79k £110.03k £74.72k £80.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.59k £2.46k £1.74k £5.37k £2.31k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0