WOODSEATS MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 700669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £20.18k £24.98k £20.40k £26.09k £4.14k
Total expenditure £24.04k £21.30k £19.24k £24.91k £4.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A