ST BRIDGET'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 701956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required