ST BRIDGET'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 701956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Mary Waring Trustee 20 October 2019 None on record
Rev Alexandra Christine Williams Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
Peter George Hinton Trustee 21 March 2015
THE FRIENDS OF HILBRE Received: On time
IRISH COMMUNITY CARE Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL & ALL ANGELS, NEWTON, WEST KIRBY, WIRRAL Received: On time
Professor Philip Cornford Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Alison Jean Wright Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record