NEWGROUND TOGETHER

Charity number: 702800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Fowler Trustee 07 July 2021 None on record
Gwynne Furlong Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
Malcolm Ivan Harrison Chair 07 March 2018 None on record
Alan Cotton Trustee 27 July 2017 None on record
JOHN TOWNEND Trustee 07 January 2014
CHILD ACTION NORTHWEST Received: On time
James Hartley Trustee 16 April 2015 None on record
KEVIN LEITH Trustee 07 January 2014 None on record
Zaffer Khan Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record