Financial history INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR ENVIRONMENT AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 800066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.03m £20.73m £20.84m £18.42m £18.19m
Total expenditure £21.01m £20.64m £20.55m £18.58m £18.29m
Income from government contracts £184.48k N/A £8.28m £9.93m £232.42k
Income from government grants £10.13m £7.37m N/A N/A £9.54m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £21.01m £20.72m £20.82m £18.40m £18.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.68k £9.63k £17.40k £11.40k £2.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.01m £20.64m £20.55m £18.58m £18.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £107.08k £116.87k £135.85k £78.93k £46.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0