Trustees INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR ENVIRONMENT AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 800066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Damian George Trustee 06 December 2021
ACTIONAID
Received: On time
CALM MEDIATION
Received: On time
Dr Alicia Perez-Porro Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Professor Maarten Krispijn van Aalst Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Gabriel Quijandria Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Professor Cheikh Mbow Trustee 06 December 2021
None on record
Dr Tara Shine Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Bara Gueye Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Silvia Charpentier Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Batkhishig Baival Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
Maria Mahl Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
SHEELA PATEL Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Les Campbell Trustee 23 November 2017
None on record