Financial history SPECIAL OLYMPICS GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 800329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.25m £1.78m £2.27m £1.06m £1.12m
Total expenditure £3.89m £1.63m £1.91m £1.03m £1.14m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £531.63k £86.67k £393.67k £218.61k £228.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.82m £1.28m £1.32m £12.78k £692.92k
Income - Other trading activities £265.87k £203.55k £283.88k £399.99k £273.25k
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £292.95k £662.77k £65.60k £133.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £464 £176 £252 £161 £1.09k
Income - Other £3.05k £1.71k £5.66k £6.84k £16.30k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.71m £1.49m £1.79m £979.74k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £175.90k £132.79k £121.88k £45.83k £106.97k
Expenditure - Governance £38.09k £103.71k £0 £166.87k £229.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £59.87k £24.45k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0