SPECIAL OLYMPICS GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 800329

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andy Young Trustee 12 December 2019 None on record
Dr Dawn Brace Trustee 17 October 2019 None on record
ROBERT ANDREW POWELL Trustee 30 March 2016 None on record
Professor Jan Burns MBE Trustee 30 March 2016 None on record
Charles Joachim Classen Trustee 19 August 2019 None on record
Laura Smith Trustee 22 November 2013 None on record
Emma Louise Rose Trustee 21 September 2019 None on record
Alison Rayson Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
KIERA BYLAND Trustee 12 March 2020 None on record
Andrew Charles Baker Trustee 19 September 2019 None on record
PAUL RICHARDSON Chair 12 December 2019 None on record