BOURNEMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 800397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 11 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 06 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 06 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2017 On time Download