BOURNEMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 800397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £52.62k £49.96k £50.28k £69.06k £53.65k
Total expenditure £50.19k £52.60k £52.89k £65.03k £50.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A