BOURNEMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 800397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS JENNIE PUDNEY Trustee None on record
Patricia Ley Chair 18 October 2018 None on record
JOHN ORAM Trustee None on record
Julie Williams Trustee 08 November 2013 None on record
Rodney Jackson FCCA Trustee 19 October 2017 None on record
Margaret Ronchetti Trustee 20 October 2016 None on record
Keith Pitman Trustee 08 November 2013 None on record
Robert James Hucklesby Trustee 17 October 2019 None on record
Graham Ian Maughan Trustee 17 October 2019 None on record
Valerie June Arthur Trustee 11 November 2013 None on record
Howard Melvyn Fincher Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record