RURAL MISSION SOLUTIONS LTD

Charity number: 802305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JAMES THOMAS MULLIN Trustee 08 October 2012 None on record
HEATHER FREDERICK Trustee 15 May 2017
ACTION FOR CHRIST Received: On time
CAPTAIN GORDON BANKS Trustee 08 June 2015 None on record
ELIZABETH INGRAM MBE Trustee 12 October 2015
ACTION FOR CHRIST Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER KNOTT Trustee 27 September 2012
PROCLAMATION ZAMBIA Received: On time
STARFISH MALAWI Received: On time
MISSION FOR CHRIST Received: On time