Financial history The Dallinghoo Church Repair Fund

Charity number: 803135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £869 £1.50k £48.09k £59.43k £18.59k
Total expenditure £100 £16 £23.81k £55.38k £35.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A