Trustees The Dallinghoo Church Repair Fund
Charity number: 803135

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY DENIS QUINLAN | Chair | 15 June 1989 |
|
|
||||
Rennison James Hammond | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Hammond | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hope Hedley | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Sullivan | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Charles TYE | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Tye | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|||||
LINDA ANN LING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.