Trustees MOOR MEADOW CHARITY

Charity number: 810353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRIS DRUCE Chair
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OFTHE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, THATCHAM
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHRISTINE SUSAN RICE Trustee 06 December 2021
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OFTHE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, THATCHAM
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Paul Douglas Bullock Trustee 20 December 2020
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OFTHE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, THATCHAM
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Colin Leslie Waters Trustee 20 December 2020
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OFTHE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, THATCHAM
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
PRUDENCE CORDELIA FENN Trustee 08 December 2015
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
GARY JOHN PUFFETT Trustee 07 December 2015
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
MICHAEL JON de COURCY COLE Trustee 03 December 2012
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Mark David Bennet Trustee 11 September 2012
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
LADY FRANCES WINCHCOMBE'S THATCHAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WESTCOTT HOUSE
Received: On time
BRIAN GEORGE WHEELER Trustee
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time