SEAHAVEN WILDLIFE RESCUE

Charity number: 1163126
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 January 2020 04 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2020 11 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 12 August 2018 02 July 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2018 11 August 2019 60 days late Download
Annual return 12 August 2017 15 June 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2017 15 June 2018 3 days late Download
Annual return 12 August 2016 14 June 2018 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2016 14 June 2018 367 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)