THE ROCK ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158478
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A £1.55k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £22.20k £32.05k £35.49k £37.71k £32.32k
Total expenditure £14.89k £31.33k £33.97k £34.98k £35.23k