Trustees Family Holiday Charity
Charity number: 800262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Anne Harris | Chair | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Davinia Batley | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giulia Maria Said | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
INGRID BUSSELL | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hills | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Ann Kerslake | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Tucker | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Saxon | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Montague Appleby | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.