Trustees PETER LATHOM (INCLUDING THE LATHOM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Charity number: 228828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
50 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BYRON | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Gurbax Woods | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Rigby | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Philip John Atty | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Joseph McConnell | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Procter | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Brake | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Grahame Green | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Cllr Gaynar Owen | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Draper | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Janine Clayton | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JANET MARY CAUNCE | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
GILL STUBBS | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Murrin Bailey | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
FRANK JOHNSON | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
DERICK MOSS | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
ALICE COREN | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
DIANE BONNEY | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Gregson | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ROBINA CRITCHLEY | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL ADRIAN BLAIR WILCOX | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN LAMB | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
BRIAN BAILEY | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
HUGH JAMES SLOAN | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
ADAM YATES | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH CARRUTHERS | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JULIA PEGGS | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
GILLIAN ELIZABETH RAINFORD | Trustee | 25 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
HARDISTY DAVID | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
KAY BEATTY | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ALLISON JAYNE CROFT | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MICHELE SKINLEY | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PAMELA SLOAN | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|||||||
KATHLEEN ALMOND | Trustee | 31 October 2015 |
|
|||||||
PAUL COTTERILL | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
KATHLEEN VIVIEN CUMMINGS | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
EDWARD GERRARD POPE | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
CLLR. MAY BLAKE | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
LISA MOLYNEUX | Trustee | 22 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL MILLER | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||
JANE MARSHALL | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
ALAN WHITTAKER | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
MR A OWENS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JIM HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HILARY ROSBOTHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IAN ROY TINSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WILLIAM JOSEPH CROPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EILEEN MARY DORAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN DAVID SNAPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SHEILA EDGECOMBE BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.