Trustees THORNBURY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 311705
Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW GRIFFITHS | Chair | 20 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Stansfield | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keiran Patrick John Warren | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Kevin Parfit | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS HOLLAND | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WEAVER | Trustee | 20 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE ARTHUR DAVIDGE | Trustee | 22 July 1992 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM HEAVEN | Trustee | 22 July 1992 |
|
|
||||
ERIC JAMES ANDREWS | Trustee | 22 July 1992 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.