Trustees THE CATHOLIC RECORD SOCIETY
Charity number: 313529
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Carmen Margaret Mangion | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Liam Temple | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Scholastica Jacob | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Judith Frances Champ DSS | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Clemence Power | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Kilburn | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Smeaton | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Edmund Boyle Harris | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Susan O'Brien | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Catherine Mary Gibbons | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Benedict Nockles | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Arblaster | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Fitzalan Howard | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Aldjo Jamieson | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr PETER HUGH GERARD DOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.