Trustees BRISTOL SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1091301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Williams | Chair | 02 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Eccles | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Aaron Wheatley | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER WHITER | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harper | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Turner | Trustee | 05 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Scott Stowell | Trustee | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Harding | Trustee | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
TONY REES | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES THOMAS | Trustee | 29 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Nick Winter | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.