Governing document WADHAM COLLEGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 20 DECEMBER 1612 STATUTES LAST AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 2009 11 FEB 2009 07 APR 2011 28 APR 2014 15 JUL 2015 16 MAR 2016 21 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
TO BE A COLLEGE - AD LAUDEM, GLORIAM, ET HONOREM OMNIPOTENTIS DEI, BONARUM LITERARUM INCREMENTUM, AC COMMUNEM HUJUS REGNI UTILITATEM - TRANSLATED AS: TO THE PRAISE GLORY AND HONOUR OF ALMIGHTY GOD, THE INCREASE OF GOOD LEARNING AND THE COMMON BENEFIT OF THIS REALM.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.