Trustees WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1112775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Widdowson | Chair | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Abda Bibi Khan | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Armor | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Craib | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamey Johnson | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Mason | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann McArdle | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Michael Doyle | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Robert Grady | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Grant | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Patricia Hazel Kynaston | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Mark Layer | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Robin Cook | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Threadkell | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Pearson | Trustee | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.