Trustees WYLDE GREEN UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1136135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Ann Coney | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Goring | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Bernard Coney | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Madill | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rowe | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason James Gardner | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Lister | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Anne Fowler | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Ann Willis | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Jane Lyne | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.