Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EPSOM
Charity number: 1134149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD NICHOLAS ANTHONY PARISH | Chair | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy John Padwick | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Henry Jeffery | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lutton | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Gilbert | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Williams | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jeffery | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Angus | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JAMES KEITH | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANNE MITCHELL | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||
MARTYN JAY HOLLOWAY-NEVILLE | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Margaret TOPLEY | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR HOWARD BLUETT | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE JOHN IMPEY | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHRISTOPHER DEAVIN | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES EGGETT | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.