Trustees BARTON ON SEA METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1135451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHARLES WHITE | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Dean | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY HAVERS MSc BScEng | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MOIR | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TREVOR HOLDEN BSc Hons | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher John Slade BSc Hons | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|||||
SHIRLEY HEWITT | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH WARD | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Alison Margaret White | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Levett | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA RITA MOIR | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD STOPHER MCIEH | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PATRICIA HAVERS | Trustee | 08 April 2011 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL HAROLD STOPHER | Trustee | 09 February 2005 |
|
|||||
Rodney Oliver Betts | Trustee |
|
||||||
WENDY MARGARET HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK ANTHONY HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.