Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS MATTISHALL AND ST PETER'S MATTISHALL BURGH
Charity number: 1135038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Loades | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Cossey | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev VICTORIA VENMORE-ROWLAND | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL LYNN BUMPASS | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE JANE STEVENSON | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY THURGILL | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|||||
PAULINE COX | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|||||
ALAN COSSEY | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALEXANDER RUDLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA FRANCES CRAWSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.