Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BOTOLPH-WITHOUT-BISHOPSGATE
Charity number: 1135985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Lee | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Slaughter | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Davis | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lawrance | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Coles | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
The Revd David Thomas Armstrong | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|||||
WENDY HYDE | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anita Ferris | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS CHARLES CRESWICK GOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALASTAIR GRAHAME HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Francis Edward Curtiss | Trustee |
|
||||||
MS CHRIS WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.