Trustees LEICESTER SHRI MURUGAN (HINDU) TEMPLE
Charity number: 1141315
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kirupananthan Seenithamby | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kanagiah Nirmalakumar | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAIYAN THULANGANATHAN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAHENDRARAJAH THILLAINATHAN | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BASKARAN NADASAN | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SELLATHAMBY MANIVANNAN BSC | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.