VOLUNTEERING MATTERS

Charity number: 291222
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Heal Chair 16 December 2015
THE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS Charity reporting is up to date
BALLETBOYZ LTD Charity reporting is up to date
Emmanuel Ayoola Trustee 17 March 2020
GRACE SUSTAINS AFRICA Recently registered
Katrina Lambert Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
Katerina Rudiger Trustee 13 December 2016 None on record
Simon Judge Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
Peter Bailey Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
Julie Kirkbride Trustee 13 December 2016
NEW SCHOOLS NETWORK Charity reporting is up to date
Sue Maskrey Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
Patrick Luong Trustee 13 December 2016 None on record
DAVID LINDOW WILKINSON Trustee 07 June 2012 None on record
IONA WYN Trustee 29 June 2017 None on record
Andrew Hudson Trustee 16 December 2015
CIRCLE CARE AND SUPPORT Charity reporting is up to date
Zara Todd Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record