Trustees THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 279882
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Joanna Margaret Jackson | Chair | 02 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Jane Frances Hislop | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Thomas William Wainwright | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Catherine Jane Minns Lowe | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Terence Garcia | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
William David FitzGerald | Trustee | 02 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rekha Soni | Trustee | 02 April 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.