Trustees THE ASDA FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1124268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristian Horabin | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karl Andrew Doyle | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia McVie | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Kelly Jane Hart | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Emmanuel Leach | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Wittenberg | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Benton | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ashby | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Oldroyd | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rehman Minshall | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Earnshaw | Trustee | 11 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.